SOMALI INTEGRATION AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
our mission is to help the Somali Community, improve the quality of their lives and enable them to play a fully empowered and effective role in wider society by bringing people together, sharing knowledge and co-ordinating activity and opinion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £59,360 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Djibouti
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 18 May 2016: CIO registration
- 19 January 2018: Funds received from 1084999 SOMALI INTEGRATION & DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION (SIDA...
- SIDA; SIDA UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nasir Abdi | Chair | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amal Ahmed Ali | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM DERIA | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Weli Farah Farah | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edil Essa | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.70k | £146.24k | £202.47k | £83.01k | £85.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.00k | £110.08k | £190.78k | £76.44k | £84.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £56.00k | £71.88k | £120.00k | £59.36k | £59.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC LIVING IN THE UK WHO ARE SOMALI OR OF SOMALI DESCENT: A. BY RELIEVING PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; B. BY ADVANCING EDUCATION; AND C. BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED. (2) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS FROM SOMALIA AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE RESIDENT OR ARE INTENDING TO RESIDE IN THE UK BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETATION SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS ASYLUM, IMMIGRATION, MONEY, DEBT, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT. (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS, PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SOMALIA AND HORN OF AFRICA COUNTRIES, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES TO IMPROVE SCHOOLS, CLEAN WATER SUPPLIES, SELF-HELP PROJECTS, MEDICAL AID AND SUCH OTHER FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM NECESSARY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOMALIINTEGRATION&DEVELOPMENTASSOCI
UNIT 50
CAMBERWELL BUSINESS CENTRE
99-103 LOMOND GROVE
LONDON
SE5 7HN
- Phone:
- 02073583274
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window