THE CANADA-UK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of the Canada-UK Foundation is to broaden perspectives and encourage new thinking and collaboration on issues and topics that build stronger links between Canada and the United Kingdom. The Foundation exists to support and foster a greater understanding of Canada and the contributions made by Canadians to the international community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 25 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Gallant | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Scott McVittie | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kaylyn Fraser | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Johnson | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Lay | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Douglas McPhee | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jerry del Missier | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brant | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Lowe | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £42.71k | £18.14k | £7.46k | £7.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250.01k | £271.89k | £188.12k | £101.76k | £110.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Aug 2016 as amended on 30 Aug 2024 as amended on 30 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are: 1. the advancement of the education of the public in Canada and the United Kingdom concerning the culture, heritage, history, Indigenous groups, environment and other matters relating to both countries, by doing the following: i) providing structured learning programs, including but not limited to, seminars, workshops and panel discussions; ii) providing endowments to educational institutions in the United Kingdom of chairs of Canadian studies; and iii) providing grants, bursaries and scholarships or other forms of financial assistance to any person to enrol in educational institutions and/or training programmes in the United Kingdom or Canada; 2. to relieve poverty, distress and sickness for the public benefit, particularly for Canadian citizens or persons of Canadian origin and their families, special regard being given to the relief of need amongst former Canadian Armed Forces men and women and their dependents who are in need and resident in the United Kingdom, including, without limitation, providing financial assistance to in-need Canadian veterans and their families living in the United Kingdom by organising fundraising events; and 3. the advancement of health or the saving of lives by gifting funds to registered charities involved in cancer research and to raise awareness of cancer research, including, without limitation, organising and promoting various Terry Fox Runs for Cancer Research in the United Kingdom.
Linked charities
- 25 February 2004 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canada UK Foundation
Canada House
5 Trafalgar Square
London
SW1Y 5BJ
- Phone:
- 07521736604
- Email:
- info@mapleleaftrust.com
- Website:
-
mapleleaftrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window