WOMEN'S VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Women's Voice is a charitable organisation run by women for women in Hastings and St Leonards. It seeks to challenge all prejudice and discrimination with a particular focus on sexism. To meet this aim, Women's Voice organises a number of events and activities relating to women, including hosting International Women's Day (8 March).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Caley | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chiara Capraro | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Allen | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Erica Jane Smith | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Hartley | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Louise Carlyle | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Christin a Hughes | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/08/2020 | 15/08/2021 | 15/08/2022 | 15/08/2023 | 15/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.32k | £5.53k | £2.39k | £4.40k | £19.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.98k | £4.53k | £4.82k | £2.28k | £8.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 August 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 August 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 August 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF WOMEN IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF WOMEN’S HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY OF WOMEN RESIDENT IN HASTINGS AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THEIR PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING, ADVANCING THEIR SOCIAL INCLUSION, FACILITATING THEIR ACCESS TO INFORMATION WHICH SUPPORTS AND RELIEVES THEIR NEEDS AND ADVANCES THEIR EDUCATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIVES OF SAID WOMEN. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 The Leas
Essenden Road
ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN38 0PU
- Phone:
- 07904777476
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window