Financial history NOAH'S ARK SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1168159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.20k £39.28k £43.65k £44.47k £43.57k
Total expenditure £21.70k £12.84k £19.22k £25.25k £30.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A