DEMENTIA HARBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dementia Harborough is aimed at people in Market Harborough and surrounding areas recently diagnosed with dementia with their carers, to provide fun, companionship and information. We run a monthly Dementia Cafe with activities and guest speakers. Our monthly Singing for Memories group offers the opportunity to join in song and music. Additionally we arrange other activities and outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 28 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK BINGHAM TITUS WATTS | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Gordon Cross | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Eyles | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RUSSELL HENDERSON | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Helen Friend | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hirst | Trustee | 16 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GLENN HARTSHORN | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARGARET MEREDITH | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE FRASER | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.95k | £13.57k | £7.15k | £7.83k | £16.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.14k | £6.94k | £7.00k | £11.36k | £9.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE SUFFERING WITH DEMENTIA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RECENTLY DIAGNOSED WITH DEMENTIA, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES, IN THE EAST MIDLANDS AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY: A) LIAISON WITH REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER BODIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS B) WORKING WITH SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL STUDENTS IN ORDER TO REDUCE THE FEAR AND LACK OF UNDERSTANDING OF THE CONDITION AND TO CREATE A BRIDGE BETWEEN THE GENERATIONS C) BY PROVIDING REGULAR ACTIVITIES WHERE SERVICE USERS CAN INTERACT WITH OTHERS, WHICH ARE WELCOMING AND OFFER A CARING AND SYMPATHETIC ENVIRONMENT D) PROVIDING SERVICE USERS WITH INFORMATION CONCERNING DEMENTIA AND THE SOURCES OF SUPPORT AVAILABLE TO THEM E) ENGAGING IN ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY SUPPORT THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Ireton Road
MARKET HARBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE16 9NU
- Phone:
- 07594649566
- Email:
- info@dementiaharborough.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window