NUFFIELD INTERNATIONAL FARMING SCHOLARSHIPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) providing scholarships to Beneficiaries to learn about the practices and techniques employed in different parts of the world and to develop best-practices based upon this learning; and (2) providing a forum for the exchange and dissemination of information among Beneficiaries about agricultural, horticultural, fishing and countryside management best practices and related information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Australia
- Brazil
- Canada
- China
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- France
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Romania
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 05 September 2016: Standard registration
- NUFFIELD INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christoph Gevehard Graf Grote | Chair | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laure Annie Figeureu-Bidaud | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Gary Rawson | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roy Johan Tomesen | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Francis Bennett | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Walter Edwin Kee | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Larocque | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luciano Jan Loman | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Scott | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Weller | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Brady | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Brownhill | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Martin Davies | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £486.82k | £247.40k | £183.43k | £297.54k | £244.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £489.68k | £178.99k | £117.48k | £185.19k | £171.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, FISHING, FOOD SUPPLY CHAIN AND COUNTRYSIDE MANAGEMENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY: (1) PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS TO BENEFICIARIES TO LEARN ABOUT THE PRACTICES AND TECHNIQUES EMPLOYED IN DIFFERENT PARTS OF THE WORLD AND TO DEVELOP BEST-PRACTICES BASED UPON THIS LEARNING; AND (2) PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE EXCHANGE AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AMONG BENEFICIARIES ABOUT AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURAL, FISHING, AND COUNTRYSIDE MANAGEMENT BEST PRACTICES AND RELATED INFORMATION. ‘BENEFICIARIES’ MEANS THOSE ENGAGED IN FARMING, HORTICULTURE, OR FORESTRY AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southill Farm
Staple Fitzpaine
Taunton
TA3 5SH
- Phone:
- 01460234012
- Email:
- director@nuffieldscholar.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window