THE ANWAR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity gives donations to other trusted local charities to help alleviate poverty, provide health care to those in dire need and provide relief to disaster stricken areas of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 10 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABID ANWAR | Chair | 03 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
ZAHID ANWAR | Trustee | 03 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
TARIQ ANWAR | Trustee | 03 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.21k | £113.05k | £34.76k | £18.31k | £54.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.26k | £109.57k | £47.40k | £18.96k | £54.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY E.G. DONATING TO ORGANISATIONS SUCH AS SHELTER, BARNADO'S, AND THE LIKE WITHIN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA AND STRICKEN AREAS IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEATH, DISABILITY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP WITHIN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA GIVING A HELPING HAND ESPECIALLY THE HOMELESS AND ELDERLY WE AIM TO HELP OTHER ORGANISATIONS DOING SIMILAR WORK AND TO SET UP NEW VENTURES TO FULFIL OUR OBJECTIVES FOCUSSING ON AREAS WHERE THERE IS NO HELP AT PRESENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
Trafalgar Business Park
Broughton Lane
Ellis Street Entrance
Manchester
- Phone:
- 07961405505
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window