THE JOHN MACTAGGART TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A small charitable trust, who makes grants and donations to other charitable organisations and voluntary bodies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 09 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR JOHN AULD MACTAGGART | Chair | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Aphra Mactaggart | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
KINVARA MAY MACTAGGART | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN AULD MACTAGGART | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|||||
SHOLTO AULD MACTAGGART | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.00k | £10.00k | £14.42k | £7.57k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £15.00k | £11.77k | £779 | £7.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
"2.2 THE "OBJECTS" ARE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 2.3 THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APPLIED AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT THE INCOME AND IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY FOR CHARITABLE REASONS ACCUMULATE ANY PART OF THE INCOME FOR SUCH PERIOD AS MAY BE PERMITTED BY LAW."
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BABMAES STREET
LONDON
SW1Y 6HD
- Phone:
- 02078083970
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window