THE FRIENDS OF SAINT GILES' CHURCH CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1168770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity?s objects are, for the public benefit, to preserve and protect the building, grounds and historic contents of Saint Giles? Church, Cambridge. To this end, we have commissioned an architect to examine underfloor heating, improved lighting and the creation of useable community spaces and storage. We also promote understanding of local heritage through free monthly talks.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,039
Total expenditure: £702

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 August 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOSGC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STELLA CROSS Chair 11 August 2015
None on record
Dr VALERIE JUDITH ANDERSON Trustee 10 March 2024
CAMBRIDGE SOCIETY FOR THE APPLICATION OF RESEARCH
Received: On time
Jose Luis Jimenez Pina Trustee 10 March 2024
None on record
Michael John Bloy Trustee 10 September 2023
None on record
Richard Catchpole Trustee 11 August 2020
None on record
Dr OLIVER RICHARD COATES Trustee 15 July 2016
None on record
PROF ARTHUR HIBBLE Trustee 11 August 2015
None on record
Rev Geoffrey James William Dumbreck Trustee 11 August 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS CHURCH, CROYDON
Received: 78 days late
SOUTH CROYDON CENTRE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT AUGUSTINE, SOUTH CROYDON
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.18k £21.58k £21.47k £13.45k £4.04k
Total expenditure £9.29k £14.87k £41.55k £17.06k £702
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.00k £8.37k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. GILES CHURCH
CASTLE STREET
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0AQ
Phone:
01223315000