AWRE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awre Village Hall is held in trust as a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the parish of Awre without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions and in particular for the use of meetings, lectures and classes or for other forms of recreation, business and leisure time occupation to improve the conditions of life for the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 February 2016: CIO registration
- 16 September 2016: Funds received from 301458 AWRE VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNA ALISON SCOTT | Chair | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dean Biddlecombe | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE GREENING | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Jack William Greening | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.06k | £15.14k | £19.47k | £5.21k | £3.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.39k | £4.65k | £12.52k | £11.12k | £11.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | £2.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 September 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 07 September 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 September 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 09 September 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF AWRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE USE OF MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION, BUSINESS AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Awre
NEWNHAM
Gloucestershire
GL14 1EL
- Phone:
- 07958944280
- Email:
- joannascott01@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window