SPRING FORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the relief of poverty throughout England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 April 2016: CIO registration
- SPRING FORTH CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Tega | Chair | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 398 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 398 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS I. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10B Mill Street
Brierley Hill
DY5 2RG
- Phone:
- 07903177239
- Email:
- info@springforthcharity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window