Financial history HEALTHWATCH WAKEFIELD

Charity number: 1166797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £388.95k £321.63k £383.41k £422.92k £483.89k
Total expenditure £393.20k £305.50k £366.24k £446.17k £460.45k
Income from government contracts £261.56k £261.56k £261.56k £285.67k £288.20k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £135.94k £195.45k