SIBES AND SLED DOGS HUSKY WELFARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue, rehabilitation of Sled dogs and education of their owners
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Gilder | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Hornby | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Firth | Trustee | 10 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Duxbury | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAMERON FIRTH | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.66k | £22.16k | £19.17k | £19.17k | £17.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.67k | £27.21k | £21.68k | £22.64k | £19.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 May 2021 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 May 2021 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY RESCUING, RESEARCHING, REHABILITATING AND REHOMING SLED DOG BREEDS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Brentwood Road
NELSON
Lancashire
BB9 8AX
- Phone:
- 07811163681
- Email:
- huskyrescue@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window