H E L P (HOLIDAY ENDEAVOUR FOR LONE PARENTS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide low-cost holidays for lone parentfamilies and single access parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 May 1978: Standard registration
- 05 November 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HELP HOLIDAYS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.49k | £58.85k | £20.20k | £19.31k | £27.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.96k | £44.20k | £26.50k | £18.61k | £25.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 20 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 28 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 24 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 04 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 25 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 26 May 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 DECEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 1978 AND 9 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND HELP TO PARENTS AND CHILDREN OF ONE PARENT FAMILIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISIONS OF HOLIDAYS. IF AT ANY TIME THE CHARITY CARAVANS ARE VACANT FROM NON-USE BY ONE-PARENT FAMILIES THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE MAY USE THEIR DISCRETION TO ALLOW THE CARAVANS TO BE AVAILABLE TO OTHER USERS, ON SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THEY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window