LUCAS' LEGACY - CHILDHOOD BRAIN TUMOUR RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lucas' Legacy is a registered charity raising awareness and funding for Childhood Brain Tumour Research in memory of Lucas Williams, who tragically died age 6 years. Grants are awarded by Lucas' Legacy in the UK for the purposes of conducting specialist research to find new and more effective treatments for children and young people with brain tumours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2016: Standard registration
- LUCAS' LEGACY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW WILLIAMS | Chair | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA JANE KIRKHAM | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL EVERARD | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY ANNE FARRINGTON | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.20k | £5.82k | £8.36k | £6.37k | £2.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £0 | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY RAISING AWARENESS OF AND PROVIDING FUNDING FOR RESEARCH INTO HIGH-GRADE CHILDHOOD BRAIN TUMOURS
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENWAY
TRENTHAM
STAFFS
ST4 8AW
- Phone:
- 07738094678
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window