Trustees STAR DIVING CLUB GUILDFORD

Charity Number: 1166005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Freeman Trustee 18 July 2024
None on record
Stuart Johnson Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Simon White Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
Russell Johnson Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
FRANCISCO DIAZ Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
CHARLOTTE JOHNSON Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record