WILMSLOW SYMPHONY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides the public at the Evans Hall, Wilmslow, with a series of full symphony orchestra concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 22 June 1978: Standard registration
- WILMSLOW SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALLY WILTSHIRE | Chair | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Lakin | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Huw Hughes | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN WELLS | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Patricia Quirk | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jagger | Trustee | 07 May 2012 |
|
|||||
ALASTAIR ROBERTS | Trustee | 05 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
FIONA HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF THOMASON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.65k | £13.84k | £6.04k | £14.59k | £19.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.88k | £13.16k | £2.76k | £18.37k | £18.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 February 2023 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 DECEMBER, 1977.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 PINGATE LANE
CHEADLE HULME
CHEADLE
SK8 7LT
- Phone:
- 01614858898
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window