Trustees WILMSLOW SYMPHONY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 507565
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY WILTSHIRE Chair 21 October 2016
None on record
Tracey Lakin Trustee 26 October 2023
None on record
Huw Hughes Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Dr STEPHEN WELLS Trustee 22 October 2021
THE BOLTON MEDICAL INSTITUTE LIMITED
Received: On time
Patricia Quirk Trustee 15 November 2013
None on record
Christine Jagger Trustee 07 May 2012
THE ALDERLEY EDGE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
ALASTAIR ROBERTS Trustee 05 April 2011
None on record
FIONA HUGHES Trustee
None on record
JENNY JOHNSON Trustee
None on record
GEOFF THOMASON Trustee
None on record