BABY BANK NORFOLK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the provision of essential items of baby clothing and equipment to parents and families with young children, particularly but not exclusively to those in Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLOTTE REBECCA MARR | Chair | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Louise Schofield | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICKY BROOKE | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY BEDINGTON | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £1.54k | £8.97k | £18.76k | £2.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.48k | £3.90k | £3.88k | £6.92k | £7.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY , PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING ESSENTIAL ITEMS OF BABY CLOTHING AND EQUIPMENT TO PARENTS AND FAMILIES WITH YOUNG CHILDREN AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THOSE IN NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Lindford Drive
Eaton
Norwich
NR4 6LT
- Phone:
- 01603627003
- Email:
- hello@babybanknorfolk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window