THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BURGHFIELD ST MARY THE VIRGIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 14 June 2016: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S CHUCH BURGHFIELD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Glynn Lautenbach | Chair | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sara Fantham | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Donald Buchanan | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne Pocock | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Brigden | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Russell Eatwell | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEORGE THATCHER | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Thomas | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL JAKSON-DOERGE | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN WOOD | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE EVES | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMY ELIZABETH LEGG | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER LIONEL JAMES DILLON | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
COLIN THOMPSON | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.07k | £100.29k | £87.97k | £113.39k | £102.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.09k | £89.71k | £98.42k | £115.24k | £104.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £400 | £200 | £205 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Sweetzers Piece
Mortimer
Reading
RG7 3UX
- Phone:
- 01189333037
- Email:
- admin@stmarysburghfield.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window