KILIMANJARO YOUNG GIRLS IN NEED - UK

Charity number: 1166576
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Kilimanjaro Young Girls In Need CIO exists to support the education and welfare for young people in the Kilimanjaro region of Tanzania. KYGN UK CIO does this primarily by supporting the work of KYGN in Moshi, Tanzania. Our activities are primarily fundraising through individual and corporate donations, grant applications and events. More information at www.kygnuk.org

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £55,810
Total expenditure: £54,224

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Tanzania

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 April 2016: CIO registration
  • 14 December 2018: Funds received from 1157362 KILIMANJARO YOUNG GIRLS IN NEED UK
  • 20 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1092028 GOODWILL AND GROWTH FOR AFRICA UK
  • 20 March 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • KYGN - UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.81k £39.65k £45.38k £52.20k £55.81k
Total expenditure £35.48k £37.51k £37.33k £33.73k £54.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window