Accounts and annual returns NEWPORT LIBRARY WORKING GROUP

Charity number: 1167617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 09 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 11 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 11 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 19 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 17 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 17 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 15 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 15 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window