DEWSBURY EAST COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
promotion of health and well being in Dewsbury East, provision of public amenities and recreational facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Kirklees
Governance
- 06 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Moore CLLR | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ERIC ARCHER FIRTH | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
catherine Scott | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.32k | £31.95k | £30.00k | £31.19k | £33.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.46k | £7.63k | £5.66k | £12.87k | £21.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 October 2022 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 25 October 2022 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 September 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2020
(These accounts |
28 September 2021 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN DEWSBURY EAST AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE AREAS OF EARLSHEATON, CHICKENLEY, SHAW CROSS, EASTBOROUGH, CRACKENEDGE AND HANGING HEATON (ALL OF WHICH LIE WITHIN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF DEWSBURY EAST – THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR: (A) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND WELLBEING THROUGH ENCOURAGING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL AMATEUR SPORT, HEALTHY RECREATION AND EXERCISE. (B) THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND SUPPORTING THE WORK OF CHARITIES FALLING WITHIN THE DESCRIPTION OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES (SET OUT IN S. 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011) BEING THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES. (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE INHABITANTS’ CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (E) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Disken & Co
20 Bond Street
DEWSBURY
WF13 1AT
- Phone:
- 07786983846
- Email:
- cathy.scott@kirklees.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window