CHESTER USED FURNITURE ENTERPRISE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and grant making organisation. Supporting local voluntary groups and those in need by the provision of quality low cost furniture and skill development volunteer activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Flintshire
- Wirral
Governance
- 05 August 2016: Standard registration
- 13 October 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- CUFE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.41k | £82.37k | £49.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.03k | £78.38k | £92.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 26 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 26 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 07 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 07 August 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE REUSE, RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF FURNITURE, CLOTHES, BICYCLES AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BLACON AND CHESTER BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR REDUCE OTHER DISTRESS. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL TRAINING OR RETRAINING AND THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS [OR OTHER DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE] TO ENHANCE THEIR PROSPECT OF EMPLOYMENT, INDEPENDENCE AND QUALITY OF LIFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window