MANSFIELD AND NORTH NOTTINGHAMSHIRE SOCIETY FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilities for D/deaf people- by education, social activities and religion.Hearing aid battery service. Charity events - B.S.L. Courses,Deaf Awareness raising.Deaf Church.Bingo sessions. Friday Night Social Club 7.30pm- 10.30pm. North Notts Deaf Childrens Group. Lunch Club. Games afternoon. We also do halloween and christmas social events.We also hire out our rooms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 14 July 1978: Standard registration
- MANSFIELD SOCIETY FOR DEAF PEOPLE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Caudwell | Trustee | 10 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEFFAN CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.44k | £10.07k | £12.51k | £26.93k | £21.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.50k | £11.19k | £13.95k | £25.45k | £22.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £800 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 AUGUST 1977 AS AMENDED 5 DECEMBER 1977, 24 NOVEMBER 1980, 15 MAY 1997 AND 02 APRIL 2004 AND BY SCHEME DATED 21ST OCT 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE (OR HELP OTHERS PROVIDE) FACILITIES OR OPPORTUNITIES TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIGION OF DEAF PEOPLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 WOOD STREET
MANSFIELD
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG18 1QB
- Phone:
- 01623625769
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window