VISTA TWISTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities and coaching for the sport of cheer leading and related gymnastics activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £5,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 06 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH LOUISE KEMP | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JAMES HARCOURT | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.38k | £158.58k | £118.30k | £271.96k | £325.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.87k | £162.76k | £122.82k | £258.09k | £313.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.94k | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2023
(These accounts |
31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 September 2023 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2022
(These accounts |
19 September 2023 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR THE SPORT OF CHEER LEADING AND RELATED GYMNASTICS ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Lyndhurst Road
River
DOVER
CT17 0LY
- Phone:
- 07824468458
- Email:
- vistatwisters@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window