TWO RIDINGS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Two Ridings Community Foundation is one of 46 accredited community foundations in the UK with the shared aim of helping individuals, families, entrepreneurs, companies, charitable trusts and public sector bodies connect with, support and invest in their local communities across the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire
  • Kingston Upon Hull City
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 2016: CIO registration
  • 04 January 2017: Funds received from 1083653 THE YORK DISASTER FUND
  • 14 February 2017: Funds received from 523452 EDMUND WILSON TRUST
  • 19 December 2018: Funds received from 1084043 THE TWO RIDINGS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
  • 19 November 2019: Funds received from 225468 ALDERMAN JACKSON'S APPEAL TRUST FUND
  • 15 April 2020: Funds received from 244462 FAMILIES OF OFFICERS RELIEF FUND
  • 24 April 2020: Funds received from 216900 YORK MORAL WELFARE CHARITY
  • 08 September 2020: Funds received from 504860 POOR WIDOWS OF GILBERDYKE CHARITY
  • 29 December 2020: Funds received from 236844 YORK DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY WELFARE (EAST...
  • 26 August 2021: Funds received from 1013839 YORK ACTION ON YOUNG HOMELESS
  • 27 November 2024: Funds received from 1196542 RAISE THE ROOF COMMUNITY PROJECT (HULL)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Revd Richard Frith Chair 01 June 2020
LIVABILITY
Received: On time
Katherine Gargan Trustee 18 March 2024
THE NORTH OF ENGLAND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Victoria Savile Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Katherine Blaker Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Peter Odago Oluotch Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Wild Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Emma Kissack Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
ROLLINE CHARLOTTE FREWEN Trustee 01 June 2020
MARRICK PRIORY TRUST LTD
Received: On time
Deborah Rosenberg Trustee 25 November 2019
THE TRIBUNE TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher Legard Trustee 22 July 2019
None on record
Venetia Wrigley Trustee 13 November 2017
THE DALES SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Andrew Wilson Trustee 13 March 2017
None on record
Eric Paul Downey Trustee 13 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.99m £4.11m £2.21m £2.67m £2.49m
Total expenditure £1.57m £3.40m £2.70m £2.69m £2.79m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £325.02k £431.05k £803.39k £791.42k £825.07k
Income - Donations and legacies £865.78k £901.41k £2.85m £1.01m £1.14m
Income - Other trading activities £30.29k £1.61k £13.40k £27.62k £21.91k
Income - Charitable activities £1.35m £3.14m £1.63m £1.65m £1.64m
Income - Endowments £413.88k £76.61k £2.47m £239.55k £597.51k
Income - Investment £159.97k £148.18k £181.05k £228.89k £293.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £190.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.47m £3.29m £2.58m £2.56m £2.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £105.18k £104.58k £117.47k £131.98k £111.43k
Expenditure - Governance £15.29k £18.77k £19.91k £20.21k £26.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £998.69k £2.96m £2.12m £2.05m £2.28m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £24.42k £28.03k £16.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £5.29k £5.85k £8.11k £4.52k £4.19k
Long-term investments £5.10m £6.41m £9.03m £8.47m £9.72m
Other assets £2.01m £2.88m £2.54m £2.22m £2.20m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £511.08k £775.01k £745.10k £213.14k £252.92k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Pavilion 2000
Amy Johnson Way
YORK
YO30 4XT
Phone:
01904929500