SAINT JOHN JACOB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 December 2016: Standard registration
- SAINT JOHN JACOB THE ROMANIAN FROM HOZEVA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIVIU PASCA | Chair | 30 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Bogdan Constantin Balanescu | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.70k | £337.55k | £87.76k | £563.86k | £165.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.96k | £35.01k | £62.91k | £78.37k | £77.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.21k | £3.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £563.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £365.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £198.86k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £75.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 26 April 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 26 April 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 NOV 2016 as amended on 10 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ROMANIAN ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE ROMANIAN ORTHODOX OF WESTERN AND SOUTHERN EUROPE ARCHDIOCESE OF WESTERN EUROPE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PRAYER, WORSHIP AND RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fourwinds
Leighton Road
Stanbridge
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
England
LU7 9HW
- Phone:
- 07475068095
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window