Association for Sound Design and Production

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ASDP provides education by way of training to members, mostly working in the theatre sound industry. Free training & events are provided from time to time to the general public & students. The Charity engages arts bodies, stakeholders, corporate members & experts to provide specialist equipment, skills & materials to develop sound design & makes these available to members nationwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2016: CIO registration
- ASD (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF SOUND DESIGNERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter George Rice | Chair | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ella Wahlstrom | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Hibberd | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Stroud | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hill | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sam Robert Vincent | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Gibson | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.08k | £59.87k | £47.10k | £67.48k | £76.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.15k | £45.19k | £30.56k | £68.65k | £73.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 September 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 August 2021 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 18 Feb 2016 as amended on 22 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, WORLDWIDE, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE AND RAISE STANDARDS, AND PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING, PROFESSIONAL KNOW-HOW AND DEVELOPMENT TO STUDENTS, GRADUATES, EMERGING AND ESTABLISHED PROFESSIONALS IN THE ART, SKILLS AND TECHNOLOGY OF SOUND DESIGN AND LIVE PERFORMANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Parliament Hill Mansions
Lissenden Gardens
London
NW5 1NA
- Phone:
- 07970268373
- Email:
- admin@theasdp.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window