Financial history HOLDSWORTH CLUB OF THE STUDENTS OF THE FACULTY OF LAW IN THE UNIVERSITY OF BIRMINGHAM

Charity Number: 507598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/06/2020 12/06/2021 12/06/2022 12/06/2023 12/06/2024
Total gross income £40.18k £39.90k £62.22k £42.91k £54.45k
Total expenditure £40.98k £9.71k £79.22k £45.22k £51.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A