Financial history WESTBURY PARISH HALL

Charity number: 1167871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.58k £5.42k £6.31k £9.00k £8.86k
Total expenditure £5.49k £2.96k £3.54k £6.08k £12.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A