WESTBURY PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Westbury Parish Hall Charity meets twice a year in May and November. It discusses grant applications which benefit the community in one of the following ways: through Leisure, Recreation, Training, Sport, Young people's events, enjoyable/recreational activities/events It also offers support to Westbury Village Hall Association and Westbury Community Shop & Cafe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 27 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellen Watson | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Frederick Wakeford | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUE BARRETT | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES STONE | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHY KNOTT | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.58k | £5.42k | £6.31k | £9.00k | £8.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.49k | £2.96k | £3.54k | £6.08k | £12.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 FEB 2000
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WESTBURY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF PUBLIC RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 ORCHARD PLACE
WESTBURY
BRACKLEY
NN13 5JT
- Phone:
- 01280423295
- Email:
- westburyclerk@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window