LOUIE'S HELPING HANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support, improve the lives and futures of children, aged 2-13 living in Kent and the South East with multi-sensory impairments and physical difficulties. We provide life changing support for children and their families, ensuring that the children achieve a meaningful quality of life and can aim for brighter futures based on improved physical, emotional, social and communication abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 19 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Llewellyn | Chair | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angie Curwen | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tania Horn | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.82k | £19.90k | £16.68k | £23.27k | £28.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.50k | £12.14k | £4.75k | £6.24k | £8.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
05 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
1 TO ASSIST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING, PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITIES TOGETHER WITH THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY: (A) PROVIDING SUPPORT BY WAY OF FINANCIAL GRANTS, GOODS, SERVICES AND INFORMATION; (B) PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE WELFARE, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND COMFORT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND/OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, TO ENSURE THAT AS FAR AS POSSIBLE THEY MAY DEVELOP AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THAT THEIR DIFFICULTIES MAY BE SOMEWHAT RELIEVED. (C) TO PROVIDE SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OF THE SAID PERSONS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (D) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONG SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (E) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL AND NURSING PROFESSIONALS, OTHER RELATED PROFESSIONALS, FAMILY MEMBERS AND CARERS OF SUCH AFFECTED PERSONS, BY PROVIDING TRAINING COURSES, SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES AND ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE EDUCATIVE ACTIVITIES SUCH AS INFORMATION SERVICES; (F) TO PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO THE INCIDENCE, ALLEVIATION AND MANAGEMENT OF CONDITIONS OF DISABILITY OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Louie's Helping Hands
C/O The Llewellyn School
Quex Park
Birchington
Kent
CT7 0BB
- Phone:
- 07702756476
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window