THE DUSTY SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of activities, predominantly woodworking, for people with time on their hands. The aim is to tackle social exclusion by providing an environment where people can get involved as much or as little as they wish with the activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 11 August 2016: CIO registration
- CMIS (Working name)
- CARDIFF MEN IN SHEDS (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence Bernard Maher | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Nelmes | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mari Dunphy | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.43k | £15.14k | £5.78k | £14.32k | £24.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.27k | £20.76k | £7.82k | £13.98k | £17.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELLBEING BY REDUCING THE LONELINESS AND ISOLATION OF INDIVIDUALS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 50+, LIVING IN CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ?SHEDS?; COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS WHERE INDIVIDUALS CAN SHARE, LEARN AND SOCIALISE WITH EACH OTHER IN AN INCLUSIVE ENVIRONMENT. B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. C) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION BY THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED IN PROJECTS THAT PROMOTE INTERDEPENDENCE, INTERGENERATIONAL RELATIONSHIPS AND KINSHIP BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERING BACKGROUNDS, CULTURES AND ABILITIES. I. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ?SOCIALLY EXCLUDED? MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY. D) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY EDUCATING, ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING THE LOCAL POPULATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL PRACTICE, WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH SIMILAR GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS. THIS WILL INCLUDE THE PROMOTION OF PRACTICAL MEASURES FOR THE RECYCLING, REPAIRING AND UP-CYCLING OF ITEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Dusty Forge Project
460 Cowbridge Road West
CARDIFF
CF5 5BZ
- Phone:
- 02920003710
- Email:
- admin@thedustyshed.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window