MINDFULNESS IN SCHOOLS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MiSP's programme is a toolkit that builds resilience & coping mechanisms for children & young people, whatever adversities they face. It teaches mindfulness as a life skill that they will use into adulthood, enabling them to flourish & be at their best. This allows the schools we work with to educate the whole child & build strong foundations in mental health that prepare them for the future
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 September 2016: Standard registration
- MISP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard John Burnett | Chair | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Antony Steele | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jane Dunn | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Secil Muderrisoglu | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Bleakney | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Macleod | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £496.21k | £639.06k | £457.10k | £367.79k | £467.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £457.45k | £530.20k | £497.37k | £294.84k | £380.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £80.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £558.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £34 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £530.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £7.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND RESEARCH OF MINDFULNESS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN EDUCATIONAL SETTINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARNERS SOLICITORS
BANK HOUSE
BANK STREET
TONBRIDGE
TN9 1BL
- Phone:
- 07906346825
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window