BEACH HUT THEATRE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beach Hut Theatre Company develops and stages original scripts, music, dance, puppetry, performance art (both live and digital) in theatre spaces and site-specific environments. This work takes place in Scarborough and district, North Yorkshire. Performance events are either staffed entirely by professionals or by professionals guiding community participants, depending on the given project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 May 2016: CIO registration
- 06 July 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 06 July 2023: Funds transferred to 250527 YMCA Scarborough
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.27k | £9.24k | £6.86k | £1.13k | £6.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.44k | £11.39k | £8.14k | £3.33k | £7.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £2.00k | N/A | £998 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF PERFORMING ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS, THROUGH THE OPERATION, FACILITATION AND MANAGEMENT OF BEACH HUT THEATRE COMPANY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TAKING PLACE IN, PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO, THE SCARBOROUGH DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window