SOLIHULL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH RETIREMENT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recreational activities for members over the age of 50 years; such as Short Mat Bowls, Art/Painting, Dancing, Rambling, Singing for Pleasure, Keep Fit, Tai Chi, Bridge and Whist.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Solihull
Governance
- 16 June 1978: Standard registration
- FRIENDS IN RETIREMENT (Working name)
- FRIENDS IN RETIREMENT-SOLIHULL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivien Marsh | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Young | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Brailsford | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Hicken | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Proudlove | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBINSON | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.87k | £4.42k | £34.00k | £44.55k | £52.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.50k | £3.88k | £42.42k | £47.00k | £47.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 January 2024 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2022
(These accounts |
21 January 2024 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 January 2024 | 629 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 January 2024 | 992 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2020
(These accounts |
17 January 2024 | 992 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JANUARY 1978 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
A)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE ATTAINED THE AGE OF FIFTY YEARS AND HAVE RETIRED FROM FULL-TIME EMPLOYMENT.B)TO PROVIDE,OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
SOLIHULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Radway Close
Church Hill North
Redditch
Worcestershire
B98 8RZ
- Phone:
- 07875 185282
- Email:
- BYOUNG0@TALK21.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window