Accounts and annual returns NEW BREED CHRISTIAN PALACE

Charity Number: 1169559
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 21 August 2024 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 21 August 2024 143 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 21 August 2024 509 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 09 November 2022 223 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 November 2021 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 November 2021 223 days late Download Open in new window