Financial history DIVERSE FM COMMUNITY MEDIA & TRAINING LTD

Charity Number: 1172543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £215.30k £239.89k £245.97k £247.43k £172.73k
Total expenditure £175.04k £243.28k £235.36k £204.61k £234.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £132.66k £91.37k N/A N/A £1.10k