DIVERSE FM COMMUNITY MEDIA & TRAINING LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and training of the public in the subject of vocational and life-long learning, music and other To develop the capacity and skills of socially and economically disadvantaged persons of Luton and surrounding areas in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £1,104 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 11 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOSEPH NAUGHTON | Chair | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Wittering | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chantel Sinclair | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROY ANTHONY ROBERTSON | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHRISTOPHER PLEASANTS | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.30k | £239.89k | £245.97k | £247.43k | £172.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.04k | £243.28k | £235.36k | £204.61k | £234.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £132.66k | £91.37k | N/A | N/A | £1.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN LUTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS: 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF VOCATIONAL AND LIFE-LONG LEARNING, MUSIC AND SUCH OTHER SUBJECTS THAT THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT AND HAVE THEMES OF SOCIAL IMPORTANCE AND RELEVANCE; AND 2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED PERSONS OF LUTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIVERSE F M
78A CASTLE STREET
LUTON
LU1 3AJ
- Phone:
- 07867861947
- Email:
- admin@diversefm.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window