SHIPTON STANTON LONG AND EASTHOPE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 507612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance of village hall. Organising events such as live arts, quiz nights, dances etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,360
Total expenditure: £1,588

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SHIPTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Belshaw Trustee 01 May 2010
None on record
Jane Brown Trustee 01 January 2005
None on record
SALLY JONES Trustee
None on record
BRIAN DAVID WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
JANE M TAYLOR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.94k £11.94k £12.90k £2.72k £2.36k
Total expenditure £2.78k £2.71k £4.18k £10.01k £1.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.50k £12.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 August 2024 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Shipton Village Hall
Mytton Close
Shipton
MUCH WENLOCK
TF13 6JX
Phone:
01746785522
Website:

Www.shipton-villagehall.btck.co.uk