The Charlie & Carter Foundation Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charlie & Carter Foundation, based in South Shields, provides financial support to the parents of seriously ill children with life limiting conditions which require 24 hour nursing care or specialist nursing facilities. Raising awareness of the difficulties faced by parents and carers who care for seriously ill children and strives to improve the quality of life of sick children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 April 2016: Standard registration
- THE CHARLIE COOKSON FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER COOKSON | Chair | 09 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Claire Haley | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Nicholson | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Nicholson | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Skevington | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.46k | £148.27k | £251.38k | £228.66k | £265.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.36k | £170.42k | £210.98k | £250.51k | £291.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.38k | £35.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 DEC 2015 as amended on 14 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH LIFE-LIMITING ILLNESSES OR CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES, PRINCIPALLY THROUGH: A) PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO FAMILIES WITH A CHILD WITH A LIFE-LIMITING CONDITION WHICH REQUIRES 24 HOUR NURSING CARE OR SPECIALIST FACILITIES SO THAT THE PARENTS OR CARERS MAY NEED HELP FOR THE CHILD. B) PROVIDING SUPPORT, INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND ADVICE TO THESE FAMILIES C) WORKING WITH PROFESSIONALS IN LOCAL HOSPITALS TO HELP ESTABLISH AND MEET THE NEEDS OF THESE FAMILIES D) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE DIFFICULTIES FACED BY PARENTS AND CARERS IN THESE FAMILIES E) PROVIDING A FURTHER FINANCIAL GRANT TO THE PARENTS PREVIOUSLY SUPPORTED UPON BEREAVEMENT OF THEIR SICK CHILD, ADDRESSING THEIR FINANCIAL BURDENS AT THIS TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18
DENMARK CENTRE
SOUTH SHIELDS
NE33 2LR
- Phone:
- 01914661429
- Email:
- contact@ccfemail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window