MUSIC FOR KENYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music For Kenya create opportunities for professional musicians from the United Kingdom to travel to Kenya to provide music education to children and young people in Kenya. Areas we currently operate in are Nairobi, Karatina and Eldoret region. Institutions visited include Special Educational Needs Centre, orphanages, children's hospital and primary schools.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
- Kenya
Governance
- 13 April 2016: CIO registration
- MFK (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER MILES HALL | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTIN ELIZABETH HALL | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA CHRISTINE HALL | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 817 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 817 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1547 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1547 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE LIFE-ENHANCING ACCESS TO PARTICIPATORY LIVE MUSIC SESSIONS FOR THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF KENYA BY PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR PROFESSIONAL MUSICIANS TO IMPART SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND INSPIRE WITH PERFORMANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Moorlands Crescent
Scholes
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 1SP
- Phone:
- 07402222339
- Email:
- musicforkenya@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window