KUBERBHAI SHIVABHAI DESAI TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants available to fund children's education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Tanzania
Governance
- 06 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DILIP DESAI | Trustee | 22 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
BIMAL DESAI | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MADHU DESAI | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ASH MADHUBHAI DESAI | Trustee | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76 | £0 | £100.00k | £100.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £477 | £99.96k | £99.96k | £142 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO MAKE PAYMENTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; (2) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; (3) ANY OTHER PURPOSES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT FROM TIME TO TIME RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH OBJECTS (WHICH SHALL INCLUDE THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO ANY REGISTERED CHARITY WITH OBJECTS INCLUDING ANY OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS) SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mortimer House
Clifton Down Road
BRISTOL
BS8 4AE
- Phone:
- 01179467216
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window