WATERFALLS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal purpose of the CIO is to advance the Christian faith in the United Kingdom and other parts of the world for the benefit of the the public. The CIO may advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and /or other parts of the world. The activities may include but not restricted to: Regular Public Worship Prayer Bible study Preaching Baptism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- City Of London
- Croydon
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
Governance
- 01 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EUNICE JUBIN | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIET OFORI-DADZIE | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ATTA-SAOW | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.13k | £26.73k | £36.37k | £34.27k | £76.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.69k | £24.31k | £19.69k | £29.15k | £55.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNITED KINGDOM AND OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE CIO MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. IN FULFILLING ITS PURPOSE THE CIO WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS THAT WILL VARY FROM TIME TO TIME WITH ACTIVITIES BEING INITIATED, EXPANDED, OR CLOSED, AS APPROPRIATE. THE ACTIVITIES MAY INCLUDE BUT ARE NOT RESTRICTED TO: • REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP,PRAYER, BIBLE STUDY, PREACHING AND TEACHING; • BAPTISM, AS DESCRIBED IN THE HOLY BIBLE; • THE COMMUNION OF THE LORD’S SUPPER WHICH SHALL NORMALLY BE OBSERVED AT LEAST ONCE A MONTH; • EVANGELISM AND MISSION, LOCALLY, REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY; • THE TEACHING,ENCOURAGEMENT, WELCOME AND INCLUSION OF YOUNG PEOPLE; • NURTURE AND GROWTH OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES; • EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR CHRISTIAN AND COMMUNITY SERVICE; • GIVING AND ENCOURAGING PASTORAL CARE; • SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING CHARITABLE SOCIAL ACTION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD; • ENCOURAGING RELATIONSHIPS WITH AND SUPPORTING OTHER CHRISTIANS; • PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SPIRITUAL, PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT. WE AFFIRM THE HOLY BIBLE AS THE INSPIRED WORD OF GOD, AND AS THE ONLY BASIS FOR OUR BELIEFS. THE CIO ACCEPTS THE BAPTIST UNION’S DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLE: , AS OUR BASIC CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND GENERAL STATEMENT OF OUR FAITH: “THAT OUR LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST, GOD MANIFEST IN THE FLESH, IS THE SOLE AND ABSOLUTE AUTHORITY IN ALL MATTERS PERTAINING TO FAITH AND PRACTICE, AS REVEALED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, AND THAT EACH CHURCH HAS LIBERTY, UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, TO INTERPRET AND ADMINISTER HIS LAWS. THAT CHRISTIAN BAPTISM IS THE IMMERSION IN WATER INTO THE NAME OF THE FATHER, THE SON AND HOLY SPIRIT, OF THOSE WHO HAVE PROFESSED REPENTANCE TOWARDS GOD AND FAITH IN OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST WHO ‘DIED FOR OUR SINS ACCORDING TO THE SCRIPTURES; WAS BURIED, AND ROSE AGAIN ON THE THIRD DAY’. THAT IT IS THE DUTY OF EVERY DISCIPLE TO BEAR PERSONAL WITNESS TO THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST, AND TO TAKE PART IN THE EVANGELISATION OF THE WORLD.” THIS CIO IS AUTONOMOUS AND MAINTAINS THE RIGHT TO GOVERN ITS OWN AFFAIRS, INDEPENDENT OF ANY DENOMINATIONAL CONTROL. HOWEVER, RECOGNISING THE BENEFITS OF COOPERATION WITH OTHER CHURCHES IN WORLD MISSIONS, THE CIO IS IN FELLOWSHIP WITH CHURCHES OF VARIOUS DENOMINATIONS INCLUDING MEMBERS OF THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN (BAPTIST UNION) AND WILL PURSUE SUCH RELATIONSHIPS NECESSARY TO FURTHER ITS MISSION. THE CIO WILL NORMALLY PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT AND ADVANCE THE WORK OF THE BAPTIST UNION THROUGH PRAYER, FINANCIAL CONTRIBUTIONS AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, BY MAKING PERSONNEL AVAILABLE FROM THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE CHURCH. WHEN IT IS ABLE THE CIO WILL ALSO SUPPORT LOCAL BAPTIST AND ECUMENICAL GATHERINGS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3RD FLOOR
207 REGENT STREET
LONDON
W1B 3HH
- Phone:
- 02030868966
- Email:
- info@waterfallschurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window