KENSINGTON OLYMPIA FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND THE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote music and the arts in the local community by providing a platform for young musicians and artists to perform and display their talents to the local public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £995 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 22 June 2016: CIO registration
- KOFMA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Thompson | Chair | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cosmo Senan Elms | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Ena | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE SAYER | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ashley George Stafford | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
LAURA LAMPH BAhon | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.61k | £2.29k | £8.25k | £9.13k | £5.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.56k | £1.06k | £9.58k | £10.54k | £2.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k | £995 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 March 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 March 2025 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MUSIC AND THE ARTS IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS AND ARTISTS TO PERFORM AND DISPLAY THEIR TALENTS TO THE LOCAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Hofland Road
LONDON
W14 0LN
- Phone:
- +44 7976 365964
- Email:
- Info@kofma.co.uk
- Website:
-
Www.kofma.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window