1ST MAGOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1st Magor Scouts exist to develop the skills and abilities of young people in the Magor area of South Monmouthshire. The scout troop provides practical training and activities to develop the mental and physical capacity of the young people. Activities under taken in the last year have included climbing, camping, sailing, swimming and cooking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,313 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 14 June 1975: Standard registration
- MAGOR SCOUTS (Previous name)
- MAGOR SCOUTS AND GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Belsten | Chair | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SMITH | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Rachel Elizabeth Anne Warfield | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Warfield | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.02k | £8.65k | £4.89k | £14.39k | £13.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.47k | £3.10k | £7.86k | £11.21k | £14.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
MAGOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Magor Scout Group
The Scout Hut
Magor
CALDICOT
NP26 3EG
- Phone:
- 01633501614
- Email:
- 1stmagor@monscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window