THE JOSEPH COX CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides accommodation and care for the homeless at Mary and Joseph House, Ancoats, Manchester under a Management Agreement with Contour Housing Association. The Charity also sssists in the operation of a house for homeless young people at 69 Palatine Road, Manchester in conjunction with The De Paul Trust. The Trustees continue to look for opportunities help the homeless.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £144,264 from 10 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
Governance
- 01 June 1978: Standard registration
- 16 January 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 16 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1198833 The Joseph Cox Charity
- THE JOSEPH COX (MORNING STAR) CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38m | £1.46m | £1.48m | £1.62m | £149.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34m | £1.41m | £1.44m | £1.44m | £129.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.35m | £1.38m | £1.35m | £1.53m | £144.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £69.33k | £107.10k | £60.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.53m | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.35m | £1.38m | £1.35m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £17.93k | £7.55k | £7.99k | £22.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £5.19k | £73.11k | £122.53k | £61.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.34m | £1.41m | £1.43m | £1.44m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.89k | £2.38k | £2.19k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.54k | £11.46k | £7.27k | £14.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £70.00k | £95.00k | £80.00k | £85.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.89k | £2.38k | £2.19k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 16 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 46 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JULY 1969 AS VARIED SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 13 JANUARY 1993 AND 31 JANUARY 1996.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PERSONS IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF POVERTY OR AGE OR INFIRMITY OF BODY OR MIND. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13/01/1993)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window