THE COUNTY TOY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The County Toy Library provides a toy/equipment lending service for families, groups, schools, Children's Centres and childminders in Northamptonshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,948 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 29 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORRAINE ELKS | Chair | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Laura Furr | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA SCOTT | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
EVE BOND | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.92k | £7.84k | £13.21k | £17.96k | £19.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.23k | £2.88k | £12.31k | £11.37k | £13.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £5.00k | £1.44k | £6.44k | £6.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A)THE PROVISION OF A NOT FOR PROFIT LENDING LIBRARY OF EDUCATIONAL, STIMULATING AND AGE APPROPRIATE TOYS AND EQUIPMENT FOR BABIES AND CHILDREN; (B) PROMOTING WITHIN THE COUNTY THE USE AND BENEFIT OF TOY LIBRARIES FOR CHILDREN, FAMILIES AND COMMUNITIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COUNTY TOY LIBRARY
4 PARK SQUARE
NORTHAMPTON
NN5 7LQ
- Phone:
- 07843642320
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window