THE HUMBERSIDE KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides much needed holidays for patients at subsidised cost at our two luxury caravans. Hold socials and events. Hold meetings regularly to provide patient information and give mutual support. Promote the organ donor scheme and other renal events. Fundraise to buy necessary equipment for the renal unit. Producea newsletter, mail to patients and renal staff. Provide a telephone helpline.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 08 June 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIE COX | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.17k | £8.53k | £5.22k | £4.66k | £4.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.34k | £12.18k | £9.58k | £8.35k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 13 MAY 1978 AS AMENDED 9 JANUARY 1981 AND 9 JULY 1995
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DIALYSIS AND TRANSPLANT PATIENTS AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILY AND NEXT OF KIN, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS.
Area of benefit
EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Bristol Road
HULL
HU5 5XJ
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window